Senate | 05/07/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3170C | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3170B | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3170A |