Assembly | 03/12/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.483 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3221A | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1256 |