Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.661 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3227A | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INSURANCE |