Assembly | 06/07/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3282A | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.165 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.385 |