Senate | 09/14/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.370 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.708 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a5879a | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3313B | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | referred to social services | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.990 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3313A | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO DISABILITIES | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |