Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.333 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3349A | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS |