Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.341 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1142 |