Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A2852A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1564 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3353A | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |