Senate | 03/01/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A2902 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.281 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3364A | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |