Senate | 05/31/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3366A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.534 |