Senate | 12/13/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.42 | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.596 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.574 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a9011a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1907 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3397A | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |