Senate | 02/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.271 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.292 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |