Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.428 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.255 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | substituted for a5835 | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.412 |