Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to economic development | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.759 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.484 |