Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.560 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.839 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |