Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A2756A | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.554 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3489A | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |