Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3502B | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.704 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3502A | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |