Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.525 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3503A | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.365 |