Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1288 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |