Assembly | 05/21/2024 | referred to governmental employees | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1190 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3512A | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1086 |