Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.272 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3566B | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3566A |