Senate | 10/13/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.11 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.526 | ||
Senate | 10/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.821 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a6050a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to economic development | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1569 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3567A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |