Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A3403A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3586A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1087 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |