Senate | 09/27/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.373 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.492 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a7813a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3604A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1225 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |