Senate | 12/08/2023 | VETOED MEMO.101 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.198 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | substituted for a1931 | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.387 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |