Senate | 10/25/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.588 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.504 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | substituted for a4987a | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.706 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3608A | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |