Senate | 12/08/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.702 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.74 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | substituted for a3113a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3609B | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | AMENDED 3609A | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.339 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |