Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.913 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 4020C | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 4020B | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4020A |