Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4032A | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1007 |