Senate | 09/14/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.371 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.548 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | substituted for a7258a | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4041A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.406 |