Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1008 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.472 |