Senate | 12/21/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.58 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.732 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.349 | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | substituted for a5088a | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4266A | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.506 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |