Senate | 09/27/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.374 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.596 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a5167a | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1565 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4289A | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |