Senate | 08/13/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.277 | ||
Senate | 08/11/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.810 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a3935a | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1763 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4329A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |