Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4984B | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4354A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.479 |