Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4467C | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.705 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4467B | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.487 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4467A | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |