Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.732 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4493A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |