Senate | 03/27/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2024 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.673 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.535 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4505A | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |