Senate | 05/22/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.458 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1479 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |