Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.650 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.338 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a8998b | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1637 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 4550B | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 4550A | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.787 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a3287 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1480 |