Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A5897B | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1369 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4564B | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4564A | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |