Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.306 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.434 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4580A | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 1 |