Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.81 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.651 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.389 | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | substituted for a4563 | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.803 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.603 |