Assembly | 04/16/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.494 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.390 |