Senate | 05/06/2024 | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.442 |