Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4099A | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4667A | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.146 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |