Senate | 12/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.573 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.49 | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | substituted for a5803b | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.693 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 4674A | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1091 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |