Senate | 09/29/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.516 | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.761 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a5128a | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1483 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4707A | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |