Senate | 12/08/2023 | VETOED MEMO.103 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.875 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | substituted for a4606b | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1842 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4712B | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4712A | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |