Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1248 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 4733A | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |